Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas House Bill HR539 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 04/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            H.R. No. 539




 R E S O L U T I O N
 WHEREAS, The Katy community lost a beloved member with the
 death of Paula Kay Hughes on January 8, 2025, at the age of 83; and
 WHEREAS, Born on April 22, 1941, in Pontiac, Michigan, to
 Paul Ervin Stapp and Delma Kayga Stapp, the former Paula Stapp was
 raised with the values of love, kindness, and community; she grew up
 with four siblings, Judy, Tom, Richard, and Mike, and she attended
 St. Agnes Academy and Friendswood High School, where she graduated
 in 1961 and was a member of the cheerleading squad; and
 WHEREAS, On October 11, 1962, she exchanged vows with Fabol
 Hughes, and the couple shared a rewarding union that spanned more
 than six decades; Mrs. Hughes took great pride in their children,
 Robin, Melissa, Kim, and Charlie, and with the passing years, she
 had the pleasure of seeing her treasured family grow to include four
 grandchildren and a great-grandchild; and
 WHEREAS, Devoted to her community, Mrs. Hughes served as an
 ambassador of the City of Katy, and she also acted as its first lady
 during her husband's tenure as mayor; she was a dedicated member of
 the city's Parks and Recreation Board, where her contributions
 helped enhance the quality of life for all of the area's residents;
 moreover, her great concern for the well-being of children led her
 to support such causes as Shriners Hospitals for Children and the
 St. Jude Children's Research Hospital; and
 WHEREAS, In her leisure hours, Mrs. Hughes enjoyed cheering
 on the Katy Tigers football team and the Houston Astros and
 supporting her grandchildren at their sporting events; she also
 liked attending concerts and dancing, and she brightened the days
 of everyone around her with her vivacious personality, infectious
 laughter, and great compassion; and
 WHEREAS, Admired for her dedication to her family, to her
 community, and to service, Paula Hughes leaves behind a legacy that
 will forever be cherished by all who knew her; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 89th Texas
 Legislature hereby pay tribute to the life of Paula Kay Hughes and
 extend deepest sympathy to the members of her family: to her
 husband, Fabol Hughes; to her children, Robin Lange and her
 husband, Bruce, Melissa Watkins and her husband, Chris, Kim Hughes,
 and Charlie Hughes and his wife, Susie; to her grandchildren,
 Cooper Hughes, Brady Hughes, Ian Watkins, and Tyler Hall; to her
 great-grandchild, Emerson Hughes; to her sister, Judy Hollis, and
 her husband, Ron; and to her many other relatives and friends; and,
 be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for her family and that when the Texas House of
 Representatives adjourns this day, it do so in memory of Paula
 Hughes.
 Schofield
 ______________________________
 Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.R. No. 539 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the House on March 31, 2025.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House