Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas House Bill HR553 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 04/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            H.R. No. 553




 R E S O L U T I O N
 WHEREAS, Family and friends were deeply saddened by the
 passing of Ruben Reyna Sr. of Weslaco on March 5, 2025, at the age
 of 85; and
 WHEREAS, Born in Weslaco on October 26, 1939, Ruben Reyna was
 the son of Octaviano and Dolores Reyna, and he grew up with the
 companionship of three siblings, Rene, Richard, and Rosario; he
 attended school in Weslaco and married his childhood sweetheart,
 the former Juanita Alvarado, on October 9, 1961; he was the proud
 father of four children, Ruben, Thelma, Patricia, and Rodney, and
 with the passing years, his cherished family grew to include eight
 grandchildren and three great-grandchildren; and
 WHEREAS, Mr. and Mrs. Reyna owned and operated Ruben's Body
 Shop in Weslaco for nearly six decades; he enjoyed chatting with
 lifelong and new customers alike, often sharing car recommendations
 and cups of coffee with them, and both of his sons later joined the
 family business; in 2019, it received the Readers' Choice Award for
 Best Auto Body Shop and was featured in the Mid-Valley Town Crier;
 and
 WHEREAS, A man of devout faith, Mr. Reyna was a longtime
 congregant of St. Pius X Catholic Church; a talented accordion
 player, he was known for serenading guests at family parties; in his
 leisure time, he also took pleasure in traveling to casinos,
 playing the lottery, and collecting classic and antique cars; and
 WHEREAS, Although his passing brings great sadness to his
 loved ones, Ruben Reyna leaves behind a legacy that will long be
 treasured by all those who held him dear; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 89th Texas
 Legislature hereby pay tribute to the memory of Ruben Reyna Sr. and
 extend sincere condolences to the members of his family: to his
 wife, Juanita Reyna; to his children, Thelma Martinez and her
 husband, Raul, Patricia Tamez and her husband, Carlos, and Rodney
 Reyna; to his grandchildren, Valerie Reyna Villarreal and her
 husband, Efrain, Veronica Martinez Jara and her husband, David,
 Jessica Martinez Trahan and her husband, Alex, Clarissa Martinez
 Messinger and her husband, Nathan, Ruby Reyna, Celeste Tamez, Aaron
 Tamez, and Nicolas Reyna; to his great-grandchildren, Ryne
 Villarreal, Edward Villarreal, and Austin Trahan; and to his other
 relatives and many friends; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for his family and that when the Texas House of
 Representatives adjourns this day, it do so in memory of Ruben
 Reyna.
 Martinez
 ______________________________
 Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.R. No. 553 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the House on March 31, 2025.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House