Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas House Bill HR643 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 04/09/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            H.R. No. 643




 R E S O L U T I O N
 WHEREAS, Family and friends will forever cherish their
 memories of Jonathan David Corder of Levelland, who tragically
 passed away on October 27, 2022, at the age of 41; and
 WHEREAS, The son of David and Sylvia Corder, Jon Corder was
 born in El Cajon, California, on August 27, 1981, and he grew up
 with two siblings, Jessica and Jeremy; following his graduation
 from Levelland High School, he lived in San Marcos and Buda; and
 WHEREAS, In 2020, Mr. Corder moved back to Levelland, where
 he began working as an animal control officer for the city's police
 department; he distinguished himself in his responsibilities of
 investigating animal cruelty and neglect, saving animals, helping
 to find them homes, and addressing a range of other animal-related
 concerns; additionally, he was engaged in providing community
 support and outreach, and he earned a reputation for always going
 above and beyond in his duties; he and his partner, Crystal Goforth,
 were responding to a call on October 13, 2022, when their work truck
 was struck by another vehicle; Mr. Corder and Mrs. Goforth died from
 the injuries they sustained in the collision, and their dedicated
 service has continued to inspire an outpouring of prayers and
 sympathy from the community; at the time of his death, Mr. Corder
 was attending college with the goal of becoming an addiction
 counselor; and
 WHEREAS, Mr. Corder was the proud father of a son, Cole; he
 enjoyed visiting casinos and bingo halls with his mother, and he was
 a generous man who never met a stranger; his interests included
 playing baseball and watching Texas Tech University and Dallas
 Cowboys football, and he was passionate about fast cars; and
 WHEREAS, Those fortunate enough to have known Jon Corder will
 remember the way he touched their lives with his love of animals and
 his giving and compassionate nature, and he will always hold a
 treasured place in their hearts; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 89th Texas
 Legislature hereby pay tribute to the memory of Jonathan David
 Corder and extend deepest condolences to the members of his family:
 to his son, Cole Corder; to his parents, David and Sylvia Corder; to
 his sister, Jessica Corder, her husband, Steven Brantley, and their
 children, Mersaydes, Matheu and Addison; to his brother, Jeremy
 Corder, his wife, Courtney, and their children, Eloise and B. M.; to
 his grandmother, Mary Hernandez; to his uncles and aunts, Jr.
 Hernandez and his wife, Sherry, Rick Hernandez and his wife, Renee
 Edwards, Patrick Hernandez, Margie Butcher and her husband, Randy,
 Joe Hernandez and his wife, Norma, David Hernandez, John Corder and
 his wife, Tammy, Cheryl Mauler, Jane Gray, and Susan Dillon; and to
 his many other relatives and friends; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for his family and that when the Texas House of
 Representatives adjourns this day, it do so in memory of Jon Corder.
 King
 ______________________________
 Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.R. No. 643 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the House on April 9, 2025.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House