Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas House Bill HR985 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 04/28/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            89R11881 JRI-D
 By: Martinez H.R. No. 985




 R E S O L U T I O N
 WHEREAS, The birthdays of two esteemed Texans are truly a
 cause for celebration, and Mario and Jemimah Trevino are being
 honored by their family and many friends at an event on
 May 31, 2025, in Weslaco; and
 WHEREAS, Born on May 29, 1945, Mario Trevino answered his
 nation's call to duty and served in the U.S. Army during the Vietnam
 War; Jemimah Trevino was born on March 6, 1949, and the couple were
 joined in matrimony on April 7, 1968; they have been blessed with
 five children, Ruben, Elias, Irene, Ida, and Eric, and over the
 years, they have welcomed into their cherished family nine
 grandchildren and three great-grandchildren; and
 WHEREAS, These respected members of the community are devoted
 congregants at Family Life Ministries, where they have faithfully
 served as general treasurers for more than five and a half decades;
 and
 WHEREAS, Dedicated to their loved ones and their church
 community, Mario and Jemimah Trevino are a source of joy and
 inspiration to all who have the great privilege of knowing them and
 sharing in the richness of their life together; now, therefore, be
 it
 RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 89th Texas
 Legislature hereby honor Mario and Jemimah Trevino on the occasion
 of their birthday celebration and extend to them sincere best
 wishes for continued happiness; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for the couple as an expression of high regard by the Texas
 House of Representatives.