Senate | 05/05/2025 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/30/2025 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/29/2025 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/28/2025 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Removed from local & uncontested calendar | Journal Page: 1501 | |
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/23/2025 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | ||
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/03/2025 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 901 | |
Senate | 04/03/2025 | Rereferred to committee | Journal Page: 901 | |
Senate | 02/24/2025 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 301 | |
Senate | 02/24/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 301 | |
Senate | 01/30/2025 | Filed | ||
Senate | 01/30/2025 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |