House | 04/22/2025 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 1649 | |
House | 04/22/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1649 | |
House | 04/14/2025 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1370 | |
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1096 | |
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Passed | ||
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1078 | |
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1078 | |
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1078 | |
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1062 | |
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/09/2025 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/08/2025 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/07/2025 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/31/2025 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/25/2025 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/25/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 726 | |
Senate | 03/24/2025 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/24/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/17/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/17/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/17/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/24/2025 | Referred to Local Government | Journal Page: 305 | |
Senate | 02/24/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 305 | |
Senate | 02/03/2025 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/03/2025 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |