Senate | 05/05/2025 | Reported enrolled | ||
Senate | 05/05/2025 | House passage reported | ||
House | 05/02/2025 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2733 | |
House | 05/02/2025 | Record vote | RV#1350 | |
House | 05/02/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 2732 | |
House | 05/02/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2732 | |
House | 05/01/2025 | Record vote | RV#1215 | |
House | 05/01/2025 | Record vote RV#1215 | ||
House | 05/01/2025 | Passed to 3rd reading | ||
House | 05/01/2025 | Read 2nd time | ||
House | 05/01/2025 | Laid out in lieu of companion | HB 3782 | |
House | 04/29/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/28/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/28/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2268 | |
House | 04/25/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/25/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/17/2025 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 1588 | |
House | 04/17/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1588 | |
House | 04/14/2025 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1375 | |
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Reported engrossed | ||
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 1085 | |
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1085 | |
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1085 | |
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1085 | |
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1085 | |
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1085 | |
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 1085 | |
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Co-author authorized | ||
Senate | 03/24/2025 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/24/2025 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/24/2025 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 691 | |
Senate | 03/20/2025 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/20/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/17/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/17/2025 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/17/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/17/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/24/2025 | Referred to Local Government | Journal Page: 305 | |
Senate | 02/24/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 305 | |
Senate | 02/03/2025 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/03/2025 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |