House | 04/09/2025 | Referred to Public Health | Journal Page: 1087 | |
House | 04/09/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1087 | |
House | 04/03/2025 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 970 | |
Senate | 04/02/2025 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 884 | |
Senate | 04/02/2025 | Passed | ||
Senate | 04/02/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 859 | |
Senate | 04/02/2025 | Record vote | ||
Senate | 04/02/2025 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 859 | |
Senate | 04/02/2025 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 859 | |
Senate | 04/02/2025 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | ||
Senate | 04/02/2025 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | ||
Senate | 04/01/2025 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/31/2025 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/31/2025 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/31/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | ||
Senate | 03/26/2025 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/26/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/12/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/11/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/11/2025 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/11/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/11/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/25/2025 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 328 | |
Senate | 02/24/2025 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 307 | |
Senate | 02/24/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 307 | |
Senate | 02/04/2025 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/04/2025 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |