Senate | 05/07/2025 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/05/2025 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/05/2025 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/05/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1761 | |
Senate | 05/01/2025 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/01/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/24/2025 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 310 | |
Senate | 02/24/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 310 | |
Senate | 02/05/2025 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/05/2025 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |