House | 05/02/2025 | Record vote | RV#1357 | |
House | 05/02/2025 | Record vote RV#1357 | ||
House | 05/02/2025 | Passed | ||
House | 05/02/2025 | Read 3rd time | ||
House | 05/01/2025 | Record vote | RV#1243 | Journal Page: 2612 |
House | 05/01/2025 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 2612 | |
House | 05/01/2025 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2612 | |
House | 05/01/2025 | Laid out in lieu of companion | HB 3508 | Journal Page: 2612 |
House | 05/01/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/30/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/30/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2647 | |
House | 04/24/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/24/2025 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/22/2025 | Referred to Insurance | Journal Page: 1649 | |
House | 04/22/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1649 | |
House | 04/17/2025 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1550 | |
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1368 | |
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 1358 | |
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1358 | |
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1358 | |
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1358 | |
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1358 | |
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1358 | |
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 1358 | |
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/09/2025 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/07/2025 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/07/2025 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/07/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 985 | |
Senate | 04/03/2025 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/03/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/01/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/01/2025 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/01/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/01/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/28/2025 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 367 | |
Senate | 02/28/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 367 | |
Senate | 02/06/2025 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/06/2025 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |