Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1151 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 6, 2025
Analysis February 6, 2025
Fiscal Note February 6, 2025

House Committee Report

Analysis April 30, 2025
Bill April 30, 2025

Engrossed

Bill April 17, 2025
Bill April 16, 2025

Senate Committee Report

Witness List April 7, 2025
Bill April 7, 2025

Analysis

Analysis April 30, 2025
Analysis March 29, 2025

Comm Sub

Bill April 30, 2025
Bill April 7, 2025

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note March 30, 2025