House
|
05/01/2025
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2025
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2025
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2647
|
House
|
04/24/2025
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2025
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2025
|
Recalled from subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2025
|
Left pending in subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2025
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2025
|
Considered by s/c in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2025
|
Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2025
|
Referred to s/c on Juvenile Justice by Speaker
|
|
Journal Page: 1580
|
House
|
04/17/2025
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1580
|
House
|
04/14/2025
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2025
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2025
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1050
|
Senate
|
04/10/2025
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1050
|
Senate
|
04/10/2025
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1050
|
Senate
|
04/10/2025
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1050
|
Senate
|
04/10/2025
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1050
|
Senate
|
04/10/2025
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1050
|
Senate
|
04/10/2025
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1050
|
Senate
|
04/09/2025
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2025
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2025
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2025
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 937
|
Senate
|
04/01/2025
|
Vote taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2025
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2025
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2025
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2025
|
Referred to Criminal Justice
|
|
Journal Page: 369
|
Senate
|
02/28/2025
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 369
|
Senate
|
02/07/2025
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2025
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|