House | 04/22/2025 | Referred to Public Education | Journal Page: 1649 | |
House | 04/22/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1649 | |
House | 04/17/2025 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1562 | |
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1368 | |
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 1358 | |
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1358 | |
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Record vote | ||
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1358 | |
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Vote recorded in Journal | ||
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1358 | |
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 1358 | |
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/07/2025 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/07/2025 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/07/2025 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 985 | |
Senate | 04/01/2025 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/01/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/31/2025 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 806 | |
Senate | 03/27/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/27/2025 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/27/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/27/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/28/2025 | Referred to Education K-16 | Journal Page: 371 | |
Senate | 02/28/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 371 | |
Senate | 02/10/2025 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/10/2025 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |