House | 04/22/2025 | Referred to Elections | Journal Page: 1649 | |
House | 04/22/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1649 | |
House | 04/09/2025 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1089 | |
Senate | 04/08/2025 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1004 | |
Senate | 04/08/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 999 | |
Senate | 04/08/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 999 | |
Senate | 04/08/2025 | Record vote | Journal Page: 999 | |
Senate | 04/08/2025 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 998 | |
Senate | 04/08/2025 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1001 | |
Senate | 04/07/2025 | Record vote | Journal Page: 958 | |
Senate | 04/07/2025 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 958 | |
Senate | 04/07/2025 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 957 | |
Senate | 04/03/2025 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/26/2025 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/26/2025 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 763 | |
Senate | 03/24/2025 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/24/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/20/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/20/2025 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/20/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/20/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/28/2025 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 373 | |
Senate | 02/28/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 373 | |
Senate | 02/10/2025 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/10/2025 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |