House | 05/01/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 05/01/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 05/01/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/01/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/22/2025 | Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism | Journal Page: 1637 | |
House | 04/22/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1641 | |
House | 04/17/2025 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1554 | |
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1368 | |
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 1358 | |
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1358 | |
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1358 | |
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1358 | |
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1358 | |
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1358 | |
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 1358 | |
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/01/2025 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/01/2025 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/01/2025 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 848 | |
Senate | 03/31/2025 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/31/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/31/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/28/2025 | Referred to Water, Agriculture, & Rural Affairs | Journal Page: 376 | |
Senate | 02/28/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 376 | |
Senate | 02/12/2025 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/12/2025 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |