House | 04/28/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/28/2025 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | Referred to Intergovernmental Affairs | Journal Page: 1088 | |
House | 04/09/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1088 | |
House | 03/31/2025 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 852 | |
Senate | 03/27/2025 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 782 | |
Senate | 03/27/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 779 | |
Senate | 03/27/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 777 | |
Senate | 03/27/2025 | Record vote | Journal Page: 779 | |
Senate | 03/27/2025 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 779 | |
Senate | 03/27/2025 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 777 | |
Senate | 03/27/2025 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 779 | |
Senate | 03/27/2025 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 779 | |
Senate | 03/27/2025 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 781 | |
Senate | 03/20/2025 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/17/2025 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/17/2025 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 567 | |
Senate | 03/17/2025 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/17/2025 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/17/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/17/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/28/2025 | Referred to Water, Agriculture, & Rural Affairs | Journal Page: 377 | |
Senate | 02/28/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 377 | |
Senate | 02/12/2025 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/12/2025 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |