Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1255 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note February 13, 2025
Analysis February 13, 2025
Bill February 13, 2025

Engrossed

Bill April 10, 2025

Senate Committee Report

Bill March 31, 2025
Witness List March 31, 2025

Comm Sub

Bill March 31, 2025

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note March 22, 2025

Analysis

Analysis March 20, 2025