Senate
|
04/30/2025
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1613
|
House
|
04/30/2025
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2274
|
House
|
04/30/2025
|
Record vote
|
RV#941
|
|
House
|
04/30/2025
|
Record vote RV#941
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2025
|
Passed
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2025
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2025
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2129
|
House
|
04/29/2025
|
Record vote
|
RV#804
|
Journal Page: 2128
|
House
|
04/29/2025
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2129
|
House
|
04/29/2025
|
Record vote RV#804
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2025
|
Amended
|
1-Buckley and Frank
|
Journal Page: 2129
|
House
|
04/29/2025
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2128
|
House
|
04/29/2025
|
Amended 1-Buckley
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2025
|
Laid out in lieu of companion
|
HB 2337
|
|
House
|
04/28/2025
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2025
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2259
|
House
|
04/23/2025
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2025
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2025
|
Recalled from subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2025
|
Referred to s/c on Defense & Veterans' Affairs by Speaker
|
|
Journal Page: 1580
|
House
|
04/17/2025
|
Read first time
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2025
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1370
|
Senate
|
04/10/2025
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2025
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2025
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2025
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1047
|
Senate
|
04/10/2025
|
Record vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2025
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2025
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2025
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1001
|
Senate
|
04/07/2025
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2025
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 985
|
Senate
|
04/03/2025
|
Vote taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2025
|
Vote reconsidered in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2025
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2025
|
Failed to receive affirmative vote in comm.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2025
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2025
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2025
|
Referred to Vet Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 378
|
Senate
|
02/28/2025
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 378
|
Senate
|
02/13/2025
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2025
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|