Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1271 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 13, 2025
Analysis February 13, 2025
Fiscal Note February 13, 2025

House Committee Report

Bill April 28, 2025
Analysis April 28, 2025

Engrossed

Bill April 10, 2025

Senate Committee Report

Analysis April 7, 2025
Bill April 7, 2025
Fiscal Note April 7, 2025
Witness List April 7, 2025

Senate Amendments Printing

Fiscal Note April 30, 2025

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 30, 2025
Fiscal Note April 4, 2025
Fiscal Note March 30, 2025

Analysis

Analysis April 28, 2025
Analysis April 4, 2025
Analysis March 31, 2025

Comm Sub

Bill April 28, 2025
Bill April 7, 2025