House | 05/05/2025 | Passed to 3rd reading as amended | ||
House | 05/05/2025 | Amended 1-Wilson | ||
House | 05/05/2025 | Read 2nd time | ||
House | 04/28/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/25/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/25/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2041 | |
House | 04/22/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/22/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/17/2025 | Referred to Higher Education | Journal Page: 1576 | |
House | 04/17/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1580 | |
House | 04/14/2025 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1376 | |
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Reported engrossed | ||
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Passed | ||
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Read 3rd time | ||
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Record vote | ||
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Three day rule suspended | ||
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Vote recorded in Journal | ||
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | ||
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 1086 | |
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1093 | |
Senate | 04/02/2025 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 883 | |
Senate | 03/31/2025 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 807 | |
Senate | 03/27/2025 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/26/2025 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/26/2025 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
Senate | 03/25/2025 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/25/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/20/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/20/2025 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/20/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/20/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/28/2025 | Referred to Education K-16 | Journal Page: 379 | |
Senate | 02/28/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 379 | |
Senate | 02/13/2025 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/13/2025 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |