House | 04/28/2025 | Referred to Public Education | ||
House | 04/28/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2034 | |
Senate | 04/28/2025 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
House | 04/25/2025 | Received from the Senate | ||
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1505 | |
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 1496 | |
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Read 3rd time | ||
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Record vote | ||
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Three day rule suspended | ||
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Vote recorded in Journal | ||
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | ||
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 1496 | |
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1503 | |
Senate | 04/15/2025 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/14/2025 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/14/2025 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/14/2025 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/18/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/18/2025 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/18/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/18/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/28/2025 | Referred to Education K-16 | Journal Page: 383 | |
Senate | 02/28/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 383 | |
Senate | 02/14/2025 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/14/2025 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |