House | 04/30/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/29/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/29/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2464 | |
House | 04/24/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/24/2025 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/17/2025 | Referred to Insurance | Journal Page: 1589 | |
House | 04/17/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1589 | |
House | 04/02/2025 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 909 | |
Senate | 04/01/2025 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 848 | |
Senate | 04/01/2025 | Passed | ||
Senate | 04/01/2025 | Read 3rd time | ||
Senate | 04/01/2025 | Record vote | ||
Senate | 04/01/2025 | Three day rule suspended | ||
Senate | 04/01/2025 | Vote recorded in Journal | ||
Senate | 04/01/2025 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | ||
Senate | 04/01/2025 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | ||
Senate | 03/25/2025 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/24/2025 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/24/2025 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/24/2025 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 689 | |
Senate | 03/18/2025 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/18/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/12/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/12/2025 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/12/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/12/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/28/2025 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 384 | |
Senate | 02/28/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 384 | |
Senate | 02/14/2025 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/14/2025 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |