House | 04/30/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/30/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/30/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/30/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/17/2025 | Referred to Trade, Workforce & Economic Development | Journal Page: 1581 | |
House | 04/17/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1581 | |
House | 04/16/2025 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1538 | |
Senate | 04/15/2025 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1308 | |
Senate | 04/15/2025 | Statement(s) submitted | Journal Page: 1284 | |
Senate | 04/15/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 1284 | |
Senate | 04/15/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1284 | |
Senate | 04/15/2025 | Three day rule suspended | ||
Senate | 04/15/2025 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1284 | |
Senate | 04/15/2025 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1284 | |
Senate | 04/15/2025 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | ||
Senate | 04/15/2025 | Co-author authorized | ||
Senate | 04/14/2025 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/14/2025 | Co-author authorized | ||
Senate | 03/31/2025 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/31/2025 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/31/2025 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 808 | |
Senate | 03/27/2025 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/27/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/24/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/24/2025 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/24/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/24/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/20/2025 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 645 | |
Senate | 03/20/2025 | Rereferred to committee | Journal Page: 645 | |
Senate | 02/28/2025 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 384 | |
Senate | 02/28/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 384 | |
Senate | 02/18/2025 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/18/2025 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |