Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1333 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note February 18, 2025
Analysis February 18, 2025
Bill February 18, 2025

Engrossed

Bill April 15, 2025

Senate Committee Report

Bill March 31, 2025
Fiscal Note March 31, 2025
Analysis March 31, 2025
Witness List March 31, 2025

Comm Sub

Bill March 31, 2025

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note March 28, 2025
Fiscal Note March 23, 2025

Analysis

Analysis March 28, 2025
Analysis March 22, 2025