Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1358 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2025
Analysis February 18, 2025
Fiscal Note February 18, 2025

House Committee Report

Analysis April 28, 2025
Bill April 28, 2025

Engrossed

Bill April 10, 2025

Senate Committee Report

Witness List March 26, 2025
Analysis March 26, 2025
Fiscal Note March 26, 2025
Bill March 26, 2025

Analysis

Analysis April 28, 2025
Analysis March 25, 2025
Analysis March 14, 2025

Comm Sub

Bill April 28, 2025
Bill March 26, 2025

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note March 25, 2025
Fiscal Note March 17, 2025