Senate | 05/05/2025 | Reported enrolled | ||
Senate | 05/05/2025 | House passage reported | ||
House | 05/02/2025 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2737 | |
House | 05/02/2025 | Record vote | RV#1354 | |
House | 05/02/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 2736 | |
House | 05/02/2025 | Record vote RV#1354 | ||
House | 05/02/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2736 | |
House | 05/01/2025 | Record vote | RV#1234 | Journal Page: 2602 |
House | 05/01/2025 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 2602 | |
House | 05/01/2025 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2602 | |
House | 05/01/2025 | Laid out in lieu of companion | HB 3352 | |
House | 05/01/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/30/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/30/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2647 | |
House | 04/29/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/29/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures | Journal Page: 1088 | |
House | 04/09/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1088 | |
House | 04/03/2025 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 970 | |
Senate | 04/02/2025 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 884 | |
Senate | 04/02/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 863 | |
Senate | 04/02/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 863 | |
Senate | 04/02/2025 | Record vote | Journal Page: 863 | |
Senate | 04/02/2025 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 863 | |
Senate | 04/02/2025 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 863 | |
Senate | 04/02/2025 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | ||
Senate | 04/02/2025 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 863 | |
Senate | 04/02/2025 | Co-author authorized | ||
Senate | 04/01/2025 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/01/2025 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 846 | |
Senate | 03/31/2025 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 806 | |
Senate | 03/27/2025 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/27/2025 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/27/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 780 | |
Senate | 03/26/2025 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/26/2025 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/26/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/26/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/06/2025 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 425 | |
Senate | 03/06/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 425 | |
Senate | 02/18/2025 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/18/2025 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |