Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1366 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2025
Analysis February 18, 2025
Fiscal Note February 18, 2025

House Committee Report

Analysis April 30, 2025
Bill April 30, 2025

Engrossed

Bill April 2, 2025

Senate Committee Report

Witness List March 27, 2025
Bill March 27, 2025

Analysis

Analysis April 30, 2025
Analysis March 25, 2025

Comm Sub

Bill April 30, 2025
Bill March 27, 2025

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note March 25, 2025