Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1368 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 02/18/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Miles S.B. No. 1368




 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to an emergency preparedness and contingency operations
 plan, including temperature regulation, for nursing facility and
 assisted living facility residents during an emergency; providing
 penalties.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter K, Chapter 242, Health and Safety
 Code, is amended by adding Section 242.405 to read as follows:
 Sec. 242.405.  EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS AND CONTINGENCY
 OPERATIONS PLAN; TEMPERATURE REGULATION. (a) In this section:
 (1)  "Area of refuge" means a climate-controlled area
 of a nursing facility that is designated for use during a power
 outage or other emergency to provide safety, care, and other
 resources to residents.
 (2)  "Bedfast resident" means a resident who is unable
 to transfer out of bed and unable to turn and position themselves in
 bed.
 (b)  A nursing facility shall adopt and implement an
 emergency preparedness and contingency operations plan that
 requires the facility to provide in an emergency:
 (1)  for each resident other than a bedfast resident, a
 climate-controlled area of refuge with at least 15 square feet per
 resident;
 (2)  for each bedfast resident, a climate-controlled
 room; and
 (3)  notice to the commission of an unplanned
 interruption or loss for more than 12 hours of electric utility
 service.
 (c)  An emergency preparedness and contingency operations
 plan adopted in accordance with this section must require a nursing
 facility to maintain a temperature between 68 and 82 degrees
 Fahrenheit for:
 (1)  each area of refuge designated for facility
 residents; and
 (2)  each climate-controlled room for bedfast
 residents.
 (d)  The executive commissioner shall adopt rules to enforce
 this section.
 (e)  A nursing facility shall submit the emergency
 preparedness and contingency operations plan required by this
 section to the commission in the form and manner prescribed by the
 commission.
 (f)  A nursing facility shall include in the emergency
 preparedness and contingency operations plan adopted in accordance
 with this section its policies and information on:
 (1)  building equipment, including the location of and
 type of on-site generator equipment or backup power source; and
 (2)  residents, including residents who are bedfast and
 residents who are dependent on electrically powered equipment.
 (g)  The commission shall assess a penalty in accordance with
 Subchapter C against a nursing facility found in violation of this
 section.
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter D, Chapter 247, Health and Safety
 Code, is amended by adding Section 247.073 to read as follows:
 Sec. 247.073.  EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS AND CONTINGENCY
 OPERATIONS PLAN; TEMPERATURE REGULATION. (a) In this section:
 (1)  "Area of refuge" means a climate-controlled area
 in an assisted living facility that is designated for use during a
 power outage or other emergency to provide safety, care, and other
 resources to residents.
 (2)  "Bedfast resident" means an assisted living
 facility resident who is unable to transfer out of bed and unable to
 turn and position themselves in bed.
 (b)  An assisted living facility shall adopt and implement an
 emergency preparedness and contingency operations plan that
 requires the facility to provide in an emergency:
 (1)  for each assisted living facility resident other
 than a bedfast resident, a climate-controlled area of refuge with
 at least 15 square feet per resident;
 (2)  for each bedfast assisted living facility
 resident, a climate-controlled room; and
 (3)  notice to the commission of an unplanned
 interruption or loss for more than 12 hours of electric utility
 service.
 (c)  An emergency preparedness and contingency operations
 plan adopted in accordance with this section must require an
 assisted living facility to maintain a temperature between 68 and
 82 degrees Fahrenheit for:
 (1)  each area of refuge designated for assisted living
 facility residents; and
 (2)  each climate-controlled room for bedfast assisted
 living facility residents.
 (d)  The executive commissioner shall adopt rules to enforce
 this section.
 (e)  The commission shall establish construction and
 licensure standards for assisted living facilities constructed
 after September 1, 2026, including standards for:
 (1)  the integration of backup power systems or a
 connection point for a backup power system; and
 (2)  the evacuation of assisted living facility
 residents in emergencies to other buildings on the same premises.
 (f)  An assisted living facility shall submit the emergency
 preparedness and contingency operations plan required by this
 section to the commission in the form and manner prescribed by the
 commission.
 (g)  An assisted living facility shall include in the
 emergency preparedness and contingency operations plan adopted in
 accordance with this section its policies and information on:
 (1)  building equipment, including the location of and
 type of on-site generator equipment or backup power source; and
 (2)  assisted living facility residents, including
 residents who are bedfast and residents who are dependent on
 electrically powered equipment.
 (h)  The commission shall assess a penalty in accordance with
 Subchapter C against an assisted living facility found in violation
 of this section.
 SECTION 3.  (a) Not later than January 1, 2026:
 (1)  each nursing facility shall adopt and implement an
 emergency preparedness and contingency operations plan as required
 by Section 242.405, Health and Safety Code, as added by this Act;
 and
 (2)  each assisted living facility shall adopt and
 implement an emergency preparedness and contingency operations
 plan as required by Section 247.073, Health and Safety Code, as
 added by this Act.
 (b)  Notwithstanding Sections 242.405 and 247.073, Health
 and Safety Code, as added by this Act, a nursing facility or
 assisted living facility is not subject to assessment of a penalty
 for a violation of those sections until on or after January 1, 2027.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2025.