Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1373 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2025
Fiscal Note February 18, 2025
Analysis February 18, 2025

Senate Committee Report

Bill April 28, 2025
Fiscal Note April 28, 2025
Analysis April 28, 2025
Witness List April 28, 2025

Comm Sub

Bill April 28, 2025

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 25, 2025
Fiscal Note April 14, 2025

Analysis

Analysis April 24, 2025
Analysis April 11, 2025