Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1373 Latest Draft

Bill / Comm Sub Version Filed 04/28/2025

                            By: Hinojosa of Hidalgo S.B. No. 1373
 (In the Senate - Filed February 18, 2025; March 6, 2025,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Health & Human
 Services; April 28, 2025, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0;
 April 28, 2025, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1373 By:  Perry




 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a hospital's determination to grant, deny, renew, or
 modify medical staff privileges.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 241.101, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended by adding Subsection (c-1) to read as follows:
 (c-1)  The criteria used to determine whether to grant or
 deny medical staff privileges or to renew or modify medical staff
 privileges must be applied in a consistent manner to each person
 requesting medical staff privileges or the renewal or modification
 of medical staff privileges.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2025.
 * * * * *