House | 04/22/2025 | Referred to Public Education | Journal Page: 1637 | |
House | 04/22/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1637 | |
House | 04/09/2025 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1089 | |
Senate | 04/08/2025 | Reported engrossed | ||
Senate | 04/08/2025 | Passed | ||
Senate | 04/08/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 999 | |
Senate | 04/08/2025 | Record vote | Journal Page: 999 | |
Senate | 04/08/2025 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 999 | |
Senate | 04/07/2025 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 945 | |
Senate | 04/07/2025 | Record vote | Journal Page: 945 | |
Senate | 04/07/2025 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 945 | |
Senate | 04/07/2025 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 983 | |
Senate | 03/31/2025 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/31/2025 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 807 | |
Senate | 03/27/2025 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 781 | |
Senate | 03/26/2025 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/26/2025 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 763 | |
Senate | 03/25/2025 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/25/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/18/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/18/2025 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/18/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/18/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/06/2025 | Referred to Education K-16 | Journal Page: 428 | |
Senate | 03/06/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 428 | |
Senate | 02/19/2025 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/19/2025 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |