House | 04/17/2025 | Referred to Land & Resource Management | Journal Page: 1589 | |
House | 04/17/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1589 | |
House | 04/14/2025 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1357 | |
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1097 | |
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 1088 | |
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1088 | |
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1088 | |
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1088 | |
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Vote recorded in Journal | ||
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | ||
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Laid before the Senate | ||
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/24/2025 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/24/2025 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/24/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 691 | |
Senate | 03/20/2025 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/20/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/17/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/17/2025 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/17/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/17/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/06/2025 | Referred to Local Government | Journal Page: 433 | |
Senate | 03/06/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 433 | |
Senate | 02/19/2025 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/19/2025 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |