House | 05/05/2025 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 2848 | |
Senate | 05/05/2025 | Signed in the Senate | ||
Senate | 04/30/2025 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 1686 | |
Senate | 04/30/2025 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 1613 | |
House | 04/30/2025 | Record vote | RV#952 | |
House | 04/30/2025 | Passed | ||
House | 04/30/2025 | Read 3rd time | ||
House | 04/29/2025 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2237 | |
House | 04/29/2025 | Record vote | RV#910 | |
House | 04/29/2025 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 2236 | |
House | 04/29/2025 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2232 | |
House | 04/29/2025 | Laid out in lieu of companion | HB 3701 | Journal Page: 2232 |
House | 04/29/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/29/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/29/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2463 | |
House | 04/29/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/29/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/28/2025 | Referred to Higher Education | ||
House | 04/28/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2030 | |
House | 04/25/2025 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1857 | |
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1505 | |
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 1496 | |
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1496 | |
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1496 | |
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1496 | |
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1496 | |
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1496 | |
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 1496 | |
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1503 | |
Senate | 04/14/2025 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/14/2025 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/14/2025 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1262 | |
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/08/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/08/2025 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/08/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/08/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/06/2025 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 435 | |
Senate | 03/06/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 435 | |
Senate | 02/20/2025 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/20/2025 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |