E
|
05/01/2025
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 1709
|
House
|
05/01/2025
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 2639
|
Senate
|
04/30/2025
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1676
|
Senate
|
04/29/2025
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 1609
|
Senate
|
04/29/2025
|
House passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1571
|
House
|
04/29/2025
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2112
|
House
|
04/29/2025
|
Record vote
|
RV#786
|
Journal Page: 2112
|
House
|
04/29/2025
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2112
|
House
|
04/29/2025
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2112
|
House
|
04/28/2025
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1924
|
House
|
04/28/2025
|
Record vote
|
RV#601
|
|
House
|
04/28/2025
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 1924
|
House
|
04/28/2025
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1923
|
House
|
04/28/2025
|
Laid out in lieu of companion
|
HB 3109
|
|
House
|
04/25/2025
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2025
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2025
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2025
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2025
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2025
|
Referred to Pensions, Investments & Financial Services
|
|
Journal Page: 1088
|
House
|
04/09/2025
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1088
|
House
|
03/31/2025
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 852
|
Senate
|
03/27/2025
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 782
|
Senate
|
03/27/2025
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 775
|
Senate
|
03/27/2025
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 778
|
Senate
|
03/27/2025
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 776
|
Senate
|
03/27/2025
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 775
|
Senate
|
03/27/2025
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 775
|
Senate
|
03/27/2025
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 775
|
Senate
|
03/27/2025
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 775
|
Senate
|
03/27/2025
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2025
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2025
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2025
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 727
|
Senate
|
03/24/2025
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 691
|
Senate
|
03/13/2025
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2025
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2025
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 543
|
Senate
|
03/11/2025
|
Vote taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2025
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2025
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2025
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2025
|
Referred to Criminal Justice
|
|
Journal Page: 438
|
Senate
|
03/06/2025
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 438
|
Senate
|
02/20/2025
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2025
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|