Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1499 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 20, 2025
Analysis February 20, 2025
Fiscal Note February 20, 2025

House Committee Report

Analysis April 25, 2025
Bill April 25, 2025

Engrossed

Bill March 27, 2025

Senate Committee Report

Witness List March 13, 2025
Bill March 13, 2025

Enrolled

Bill April 29, 2025

Analysis

Analysis April 24, 2025
Analysis March 7, 2025

Comm Sub

Bill April 24, 2025
Bill March 13, 2025

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note March 10, 2025