Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB15 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 4, 2025
Analysis March 4, 2025
Fiscal Note March 4, 2025

House Committee Report

Analysis April 28, 2025
Fiscal Note April 28, 2025
Bill April 28, 2025

Engrossed

Fiscal Note March 19, 2025
Bill March 19, 2025

Senate Committee Report

Witness List March 17, 2025
Bill March 17, 2025

Analysis

Analysis April 28, 2025
Analysis March 7, 2025

Comm Sub

Bill April 28, 2025
Bill March 17, 2025

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 21, 2025
Fiscal Note April 15, 2025
Fiscal Note March 10, 2025