E | 05/07/2025 | Sent to the Governor | ||
House | 05/07/2025 | Signed in the House | ||
Senate | 05/07/2025 | Signed in the Senate | ||
Senate | 05/05/2025 | Reported enrolled | ||
Senate | 05/05/2025 | House passage reported | ||
House | 05/02/2025 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2731 | |
House | 05/02/2025 | Record vote | RV#1348 | Journal Page: 2731 |
House | 05/02/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 2731 | |
House | 05/02/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2732 | |
House | 05/01/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/01/2025 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2575 | |
House | 05/01/2025 | Record vote | RV#1212 | Journal Page: 2574 |
House | 05/01/2025 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 2573 | |
House | 05/01/2025 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2573 | |
House | 05/01/2025 | Laid out in lieu of companion | HB 3663 | Journal Page: 2574 |
House | 05/01/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/01/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2754 | |
House | 04/29/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/29/2025 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | Referred to Natural Resources | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | Read first time | ||
House | 03/27/2025 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 825 | |
Senate | 03/26/2025 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 764 | |
Senate | 03/26/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 741 | |
Senate | 03/26/2025 | Read 3rd time | ||
Senate | 03/26/2025 | Record vote | Journal Page: 741 | |
Senate | 03/26/2025 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 741 | |
Senate | 03/26/2025 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 744 | |
Senate | 03/26/2025 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 741 | |
Senate | 03/26/2025 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 743 | |
Senate | 03/24/2025 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/17/2025 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/17/2025 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/17/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 567 | |
Senate | 03/17/2025 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/17/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/17/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/06/2025 | Referred to Water, Agriculture, & Rural Affairs | Journal Page: 441 | |
Senate | 03/06/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 441 | |
Senate | 02/21/2025 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/21/2025 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |