Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1551 Latest Draft

Bill / Comm Sub Version Filed 04/30/2025

                            By: Cook, Hinojosa of Hidalgo S.B. No. 1551
 (In the Senate - Filed February 21, 2025; March 6, 2025,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Education K-16;
 April 30, 2025, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 11,
 Nays 0; April 30, 2025, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote




 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the availability of automated external defibrillators
 at public schools.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 38.017(a), Education Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (a)  Each school district shall make available at each campus
 in the district at least one automated external defibrillator, as
 defined by Section 779.001, Health and Safety Code.  A campus
 defibrillator must be readily available during any University
 Interscholastic League athletic competition held on the campus.  In
 determining the placement of [location at which to store] a campus
 defibrillator, the principal of the campus shall consider the
 primary location on campus where students engage in athletic
 activities and place the defibrillator in a clearly marked and
 accessible location. An automated external defibrillator may not
 be placed in a locked case when students or school employees are
 regularly present on campus.
 SECTION 2.  Not later than the first instructional day of the
 2026-2027 school year, each public school to which Section 38.017,
 Education Code, as amended by this Act, applies shall make
 available automated external defibrillators as required by that
 section.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2025.
 * * * * *