House | 05/05/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/05/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/05/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 04/25/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/25/2025 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/25/2025 | Recalled from subcommittee | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | Referred to s/c on Transportation Funding by Speaker | Journal Page: 1088 | |
House | 04/09/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1088 | |
House | 03/26/2025 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 790 | |
Senate | 03/25/2025 | Reported engrossed | ||
Senate | 03/25/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 700 | |
Senate | 03/25/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 698 | |
Senate | 03/25/2025 | Record vote | Journal Page: 698 | |
Senate | 03/25/2025 | Three day rule suspended | ||
Senate | 03/25/2025 | Vote recorded in Journal | ||
Senate | 03/25/2025 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | ||
Senate | 03/25/2025 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 700 | |
Senate | 03/25/2025 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 698 | |
Senate | 03/25/2025 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 725 | |
Senate | 03/24/2025 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/20/2025 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/19/2025 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/19/2025 | Co-author authorized | ||
Senate | 03/17/2025 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/17/2025 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 567 | |
Senate | 03/12/2025 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/12/2025 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/12/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/12/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/06/2025 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 443 | |
Senate | 03/06/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 443 | |
Senate | 03/05/2025 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 413 | |
Senate | 02/21/2025 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/21/2025 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |