Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1568 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 24, 2025
Analysis February 24, 2025
Fiscal Note February 24, 2025

Engrossed

Bill April 30, 2025

Senate Committee Report

Witness List April 28, 2025
Analysis April 28, 2025
Fiscal Note April 28, 2025
Bill April 28, 2025

Comm Sub

Bill April 28, 2025

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 24, 2025
Fiscal Note April 17, 2025

Analysis

Analysis April 23, 2025
Analysis April 17, 2025