House | 04/30/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/30/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/30/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/30/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/22/2025 | Referred to Corrections | Journal Page: 1638 | |
House | 04/22/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1651 | |
House | 04/08/2025 | Received from the Senate | ||
Senate | 04/08/2025 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/07/2025 | Reported engrossed | ||
Senate | 04/07/2025 | Passed | ||
Senate | 04/07/2025 | Read 3rd time | ||
Senate | 04/07/2025 | Record vote | ||
Senate | 04/07/2025 | Three day rule suspended | ||
Senate | 04/07/2025 | Passed to engrossment as amended | ||
Senate | 04/07/2025 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 955 | |
Senate | 04/07/2025 | Amended | Journal Page: 955 | |
Senate | 04/07/2025 | Amendment(s) offered | FA2 Perry | Journal Page: 954 |
Senate | 04/07/2025 | Read 2nd time | ||
Senate | 04/07/2025 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | ||
Senate | 04/01/2025 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/31/2025 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/31/2025 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/31/2025 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 808 | |
Senate | 03/25/2025 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/25/2025 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/25/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/25/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/10/2025 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 456 | |
Senate | 03/10/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 456 | |
Senate | 02/25/2025 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/25/2025 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |