Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1616 Meeting Schedule

Calendar

Date
Event
Location
03/10/2025
Introduced
Last Action: 04/28/2025 S Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 03/10/2025 S Referred to Education K-16
Introduced
Last Action: 03/10/2025 S Referred to State Affairs
Introduced
Last Action: 03/10/2025 S Referred to Finance
Introduced
Last Action: 03/10/2025 S Referred to State Affairs
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/24/2025 H Referred to State Affairs: Apr 24 2025 5:02PM
Introduced
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Postponed
Introduced
Last Action: 03/10/2025 S Referred to State Affairs
Introduced
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Introduced
Last Action: 03/10/2025 S Referred to Jurisprudence
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Introduced
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Referred to Intergovernmental Affairs: Apr 28 2025 4:21PM
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Referred to Public Health: Apr 28 2025 4:21PM
Introduced
Last Action: 04/15/2025 S Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 03/10/2025 S Referred to Health & Human Services
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Introduced
Last Action: 03/10/2025 S Referred to State Affairs
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Placed on intent calendar
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 04/29/2025 S Committee report printed and distributed: Apr 29 2025 8:33PM
Introduced
Last Action: 03/10/2025 S Referred to State Affairs
Introduced
Last Action: 04/29/2025 S Vote taken in committee
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 05/07/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Introduced
Last Action: 03/10/2025 S Referred to Vet Affairs
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/17/2025 H Referred to Ways & Means: Apr 17 2025 2:29PM
Introduced
Last Action: 03/10/2025 S Referred to Economic Development
Introduced
Last Action: 03/10/2025 S Referred to Economic Development
Introduced
Last Action: 03/10/2025 S Referred to Health & Human Services
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Introduced
Last Action: 03/10/2025 S Referred to State Affairs
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Introduced
Last Action: 03/10/2025 S Referred to Local Government
Introduced
Last Action: 03/10/2025 S Referred to Criminal Justice
Introduced
Last Action: 03/10/2025 S Referred to Criminal Justice
Introduced
Last Action: 04/29/2025 S Vote taken in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 03/10/2025 S Referred to Finance
Introduced
Last Action: 03/10/2025 S Referred to Criminal Justice
Introduced
Last Action: 03/10/2025 S Referred to Education K-16
Introduced
Last Action: 03/10/2025 S Referred to Water, Agriculture, & Rural Affairs
Introduced
Last Action: 03/10/2025 S Referred to Jurisprudence
Introduced
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Vote taken in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 03/10/2025 S Referred to Business & Commerce
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 03/10/2025 S Referred to Water, Agriculture, & Rural Affairs
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
Introduced
Last Action: 03/10/2025 S Referred to Education K-16
Introduced
Last Action: 03/10/2025 S Referred to Business & Commerce
Introduced
Last Action: 03/10/2025 S Referred to Business & Commerce
Introduced
Last Action: 03/10/2025 S Referred to Health & Human Services
Introduced
Last Action: 03/10/2025 S Referred to Local Government
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S House passage as amended reported
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Introduced
Last Action: 03/10/2025 S Referred to Business & Commerce
Introduced
Last Action: 03/10/2025 S Referred to Water, Agriculture, & Rural Affairs
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Referred to Natural Resources: Apr 28 2025 4:21PM
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
03/10/2025
Introduced
Last Action: 04/28/2025 S Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 03/10/2025 S Referred to Education K-16
Introduced
Last Action: 03/10/2025 S Referred to State Affairs
Introduced
Last Action: 03/10/2025 S Referred to Finance
Introduced
Last Action: 03/10/2025 S Referred to State Affairs
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/24/2025 H Referred to State Affairs: Apr 24 2025 5:02PM
Introduced
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Postponed
Introduced
Last Action: 03/10/2025 S Referred to State Affairs
Introduced
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Introduced
Last Action: 03/10/2025 S Referred to Jurisprudence
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Introduced
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Referred to Intergovernmental Affairs: Apr 28 2025 4:21PM
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Referred to Public Health: Apr 28 2025 4:21PM
Introduced
Last Action: 04/15/2025 S Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 03/10/2025 S Referred to Health & Human Services
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Introduced
Last Action: 03/10/2025 S Referred to State Affairs
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Placed on intent calendar
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 04/29/2025 S Committee report printed and distributed: Apr 29 2025 8:33PM
Introduced
Last Action: 03/10/2025 S Referred to State Affairs
Introduced
Last Action: 04/29/2025 S Vote taken in committee
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 05/07/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Introduced
Last Action: 03/10/2025 S Referred to Vet Affairs
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/17/2025 H Referred to Ways & Means: Apr 17 2025 2:29PM
Introduced
Last Action: 03/10/2025 S Referred to Economic Development
Introduced
Last Action: 03/10/2025 S Referred to Economic Development
Introduced
Last Action: 03/10/2025 S Referred to Health & Human Services
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Introduced
Last Action: 03/10/2025 S Referred to State Affairs
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Introduced
Last Action: 03/10/2025 S Referred to Local Government
Introduced
Last Action: 03/10/2025 S Referred to Criminal Justice
Introduced
Last Action: 03/10/2025 S Referred to Criminal Justice
Introduced
Last Action: 04/29/2025 S Vote taken in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 03/10/2025 S Referred to Finance
Introduced
Last Action: 03/10/2025 S Referred to Criminal Justice
Introduced
Last Action: 03/10/2025 S Referred to Education K-16
Introduced
Last Action: 03/10/2025 S Referred to Water, Agriculture, & Rural Affairs
Introduced
Last Action: 03/10/2025 S Referred to Jurisprudence
Introduced
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Vote taken in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 03/10/2025 S Referred to Business & Commerce
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 03/10/2025 S Referred to Water, Agriculture, & Rural Affairs
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
Introduced
Last Action: 03/10/2025 S Referred to Education K-16
Introduced
Last Action: 03/10/2025 S Referred to Business & Commerce
Introduced
Last Action: 03/10/2025 S Referred to Business & Commerce
Introduced
Last Action: 03/10/2025 S Referred to Health & Human Services
Introduced
Last Action: 03/10/2025 S Referred to Local Government
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S House passage as amended reported
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Introduced
Last Action: 03/10/2025 S Referred to Business & Commerce
Introduced
Last Action: 03/10/2025 S Referred to Water, Agriculture, & Rural Affairs
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Referred to Natural Resources: Apr 28 2025 4:21PM
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Scheduled for public hearing on . . .