House | 05/07/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/22/2025 | Referred to Natural Resources | Journal Page: 1651 | |
House | 04/22/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1651 | |
House | 04/17/2025 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1563 | |
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1368 | |
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 1359 | |
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1359 | |
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1359 | |
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1359 | |
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1359 | |
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1359 | |
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 1359 | |
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1365 | |
Senate | 04/15/2025 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/14/2025 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Co-author authorized | ||
Senate | 04/09/2025 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/09/2025 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/09/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1035 | |
Senate | 04/08/2025 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/08/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/03/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/03/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/03/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/10/2025 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 457 | |
Senate | 03/10/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 457 | |
Senate | 02/25/2025 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/25/2025 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |