Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1625 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 25, 2025
Analysis February 25, 2025
Fiscal Note February 25, 2025

Engrossed

Bill April 17, 2025
Bill April 16, 2025

Senate Committee Report

Witness List April 9, 2025
Bill April 9, 2025

Comm Sub

Bill April 9, 2025

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 2, 2025

Analysis

Analysis April 1, 2025