Senate | 04/29/2025 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/28/2025 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1406 | |
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/09/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/09/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/09/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/11/2025 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 473 | |
Senate | 03/11/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 473 | |
Senate | 02/25/2025 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/25/2025 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |