Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1640 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 25, 2025
Fiscal Note February 25, 2025
Analysis February 25, 2025

Senate Committee Report

Bill April 23, 2025
Fiscal Note April 23, 2025
Analysis April 23, 2025
Witness List April 23, 2025

Comm Sub

Bill April 22, 2025

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 18, 2025
Fiscal Note April 7, 2025

Analysis

Analysis April 16, 2025
Analysis April 7, 2025