Texas 2025 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1640 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 04/23/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Hagenbuch S.B. No. 1640
 (In the Senate - Filed February 25, 2025; March 11, 2025,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Health & Human
 Services; April 22, 2025, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0;
 April 22, 2025, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1640 By:  Perry




 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to access to criminal history record information that
 relates to providers and provider applicants under Medicaid and
 other public benefits programs administered by the Health and Human
 Services Commission.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  The heading to Section 411.1143, Government
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 411.1143.  ACCESS TO CRIMINAL HISTORY RECORD
 INFORMATION; AGENCIES ADMINISTERING OR OPERATING [PART OF] MEDICAL
 ASSISTANCE AND OTHER PUBLIC BENEFITS PROGRAMS [PROGRAM].
 SECTION 2.  Section 411.1143, Government Code, is amended by
 amending Subsections (a) and (a-1) and adding Subsection (e) to
 read as follows:
 (a)  The Health and Human Services Commission, an agency
 operating part of a public benefits program, including the medical
 assistance program under Chapter 32, Human Resources Code, or the
 office of inspector general established under Subchapter C, Chapter
 544, of this code [Government Code], is entitled to obtain criminal
 history record information as provided by Subsection (a-2) that
 relates to a provider under a public benefits [the medical
 assistance] program administered by the commission or a person
 applying to enroll as a provider under a public benefits [the
 medical assistance] program administered by the commission.
 (a-1)  Criminal history record information the Health and
 Human Services Commission or the office of inspector general is
 authorized to obtain under Subsection (a) includes criminal history
 record information relating to:
 (1)  a person that:
 (A)  has a direct or indirect ownership interest,
 or a combination of direct and indirect ownership interests, that
 equals five percent or more in the provider or person applying to
 enroll as a provider;
 (B)  owns an interest of five percent or more in a
 mortgage, deed of trust, promissory note, or other obligation
 secured by the provider or person applying to enroll as a provider
 if that interest equals at least five percent of the value of the
 property or other assets of the provider or person applying to
 enroll as a provider;
 (C)  is an officer or director of the provider or
 person applying to enroll as a provider if that provider or
 applicant is organized as a corporation; or
 (D)  is a partner in the provider or person
 applying to enroll as a provider if that provider or applicant is
 organized as a partnership [a person with a direct or indirect
 ownership or control interest, as defined by 42 C.F.R. Section
 455.101, in a provider of five percent or more]; and
 (2)  a managing employee of the provider or person
 applying to enroll as a provider [a person whose information is
 required to be disclosed in accordance with 42 C.F.R. Part 1001].
 (e)  In this section:
 (1)  "Managing employee," with respect to a provider or
 person applying to enroll as a provider, means an individual,
 including a general manager, business manager, administrator, or
 director, who:
 (A)  exercises operational or managerial control
 over all or part of the provider or applicant; or
 (B)  directly or indirectly conducts the daily
 operations of all or part of the provider or applicant.
 (2)  "Ownership interest," with respect to a provider
 or person applying to enroll as a provider, means having equity in
 the provider's or applicant's capital, stock, or profits.
 (3)  "Provider" means an individual or entity that
 engages in the delivery of health care services and is authorized to
 deliver those services in this state, including an individual or
 entity that delivers health care services to recipients under the
 medical assistance program.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2025.
 * * * * *