House | 05/09/2025 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 05/09/2025 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 05/09/2025 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/22/2025 | Referred to Homeland Security, Public Safety & Veterans' Affairs | Journal Page: 1683 | |
House | 04/22/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1683 | |
House | 04/17/2025 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1559 | |
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1368 | |
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1335 | |
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 1335 | |
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1335 | |
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1334 | |
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1334 | |
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1334 | |
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Amended | Journal Page: 1334 | |
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 King | Journal Page: 1333 |
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1332 | |
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | ||
Senate | 04/14/2025 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1096 | |
Senate | 04/08/2025 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/08/2025 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/08/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/08/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/19/2025 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 638 | |
Senate | 03/12/2025 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 507 | |
Senate | 03/11/2025 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 473 | |
Senate | 03/11/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 473 | |
Senate | 02/26/2025 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/26/2025 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |