Senate | 04/09/2025 | Co-author authorized | ||
Senate | 03/31/2025 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 807 | |
Senate | 03/19/2025 | Co-author authorized | ||
Senate | 03/13/2025 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 527 | |
Senate | 03/13/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 527 | |
Senate | 02/27/2025 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/27/2025 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |