House | 05/01/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 05/01/2025 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/28/2025 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 2035 | |
House | 04/28/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2035 | |
House | 04/25/2025 | Received from the Senate | ||
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1505 | |
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 1490 | |
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1490 | |
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1490 | |
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1490 | |
Senate | 04/23/2025 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1428 | |
Senate | 04/23/2025 | Passed to engrossment as amended | ||
Senate | 04/23/2025 | Vote recorded in Journal | ||
Senate | 04/23/2025 | Amended | ||
Senate | 04/23/2025 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 Perry | Journal Page: 1427 |
Senate | 04/23/2025 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1427 | |
Senate | 04/23/2025 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | ||
Senate | 04/15/2025 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1096 | |
Senate | 04/08/2025 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/08/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/01/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/01/2025 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/01/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/01/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/13/2025 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 527 | |
Senate | 03/13/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 527 | |
Senate | 02/27/2025 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/27/2025 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |